MA H144 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 96-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the payment standards for monthly benefits for parents with dependent children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To lift kids out of deep poverty

Sponsors

Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Manny Cruz [D]
Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Samantha Montano [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. Ted Philips [D]Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Judith Garcia [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Rob Consalvo [D]Rep. Ryan Hamilton [D]Rep. Christopher Worrell [D]
Rep. Jennifer Balinsky Armini [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Priscila Sousa [D]Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Simon Cataldo [D]
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Christopher Flanagan [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Kate Donaghue [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Aaron Saunders [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Rodney Elliott [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D]Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D]
Rep. Adrianne Ramos [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Rita Mendes [D]Rep. Shirley Arriaga [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]
Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Bill MacGregor [D]Rep. Carol Doherty [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-07JointHearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H146 (Similar To) 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2953 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2580 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H513 (Similar To) 2023-10-05 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3596 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2431 (Similar To) 2023-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2433
S2433 (Similar To) 2023-08-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2023

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback