MA H1419 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4392
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to involuntary outpatient commitment for mentally ill persons. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Establishing assisted outpatient treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. John Fresolo [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] |
Rep. David Sullivan [D] | Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4392 |
2012-03-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2012 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4392 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1419 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8585&generalCourtId=1 |