MA H1417 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-01 - Accompanied S990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-01 - Accompanied S990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the coordination of mental health care for children. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Relative to the coordination of children's mental health care and clinicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Senate | Accompanied S990 |
2011-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2011 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse. |
2011-01-20 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S990 (Replaced by) 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1417 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10756&generalCourtId=1 |