MA H1408 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an apprentice training program to expedite the re-occupancy of vacant units of state-assisted housing. Housing.
Title
To establish an apprenticeship program to ready vacant public housing apartments for occupancy
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-09-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1408 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1408.pdf |