MA H1407 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kafka of Stoughton, a petition of Louis L. Kafka, James E. Timilty and Brian M. Ashe that the State Board of Retirement provide a certain pension allowance to Cynthia Smith Wilder, the surviving spouse of Kevin Wilder. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Kevin Wilder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1393 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2537 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2537 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1407 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1407.pdf |