MA H1406 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to burial benefits under the workers' compensation law. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Providing for burial benefits under the workers' compensation act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-06-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1406 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7677&generalCourtId=1 |