MA H1405 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for failure to timely report injuries under the workers' compensation law. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the penalty for failure to timely report injuries under the workers' compensation act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-03-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1405 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7675&generalCourtId=1 |