MA H1401 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring that senior property administrators and owners provide diversity goals and plans prior to receiving government grants and tax credits. Housing.
Title
Relative to provide tenant ownership in government assisted housing
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Orlando Ramos [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1401 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1401.pdf |