MA H14 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4456
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act regarding post retirement earnings and unemployment benefits So much of the recommendations of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (House, No. 13) as relates to post retirement earnings and unemployment benefits. Public Service.
Title
Regarding post retirement earnings and unemployment benefits
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4456 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4456 (Replaced by) 2014-09-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H14 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H14.pdf |