MA H1397 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expenses incurred in defense against denial of benefits by incapacitated employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to expenses incurred in defense against denials of Chapter 41 111F benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1471 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1930 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1350 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1520 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1671 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2046 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See H2783
S2047 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See S2046
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1930 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1350 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1520 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1671 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2046 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See H2783
S2047 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See S2046
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1397 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1397.pdf |