MA H1388 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the sale and possession of nonlethal electronic control weapons to certain persons when abuse orders have been issued by a court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting the purchase and possession of electronic control weapons by abused persons for defensive purposes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1404 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2052 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1425 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3350 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3355 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1451 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S821 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1018 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1365 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1049 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3516 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback