MA H135 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5091

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to regulate face surveillance. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate face surveillance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-26HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H5091
2022-07-07SenateSenate concurred
2022-07-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-06-09SenateSenate concurred
2022-04-19HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-03-24SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-11-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-07HouseHouse concurred
2021-06-03SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2021-03-29HouseSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity

Same As/Similar To

H1733 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1404 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
H2244 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1491 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H359 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S171 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S798 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S490 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S263 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
H5091 (Replaced by) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback