MA H133 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electronic voting systems. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Expanding access to election technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
S1218 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H243 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2075 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H2036 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H4164 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S2720 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5040 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H243 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2075 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H2036 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H4164 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S2720 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5040 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H133.pdf |