MA H1328 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 11 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-11 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to members of the Devens Fire Department. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Devens Fire Department

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-11SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-12-11HouseEnacted
2017-12-07HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2017-11-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2017-11-09SenateRead second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-09SenateRules suspended
2017-11-09SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-07-11SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2017-07-10HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2017-05-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-05-18HouseRules suspended
2017-05-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-04-27HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-03-21JointHearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S119 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2782 (Similar To) 2017-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2017
H3370 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3865 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3864 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback