MA H1321 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a scholarship fund to increase the number of medical providers who are knowledgeable in autism. Higher Education.
Title
Creating a scholarship fund to increase the number of medical providers who are knowledgeable in autism
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5174 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S853 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S840 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S840 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1321 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1321.pdf |