MA H1315 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4624
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to liability for the medical costs incurred by public health volunteer responders. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to public health volunteer responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4624 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4624 (Replaced by) 2016-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H989 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H988 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1963 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied S1140
H1314 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H380 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H989 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H988 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1963 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied S1140
H1314 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H380 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1315 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1315.pdf |