MA H1312 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5222
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the funding and management of the Prevention and Wellness Trust Fund. Health Care Financing.
Title
To promote public health through the Prevention and Wellness Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5222 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5222 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1312 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1312.pdf |