MA H1310 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the comprehensive permit law. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a special commission to study and make recommendations relative to Chapter 40B

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-05SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-04HouseNo further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-07-12JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H4359 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2659 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback