MA H1276 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a community health center transformation fund. Health Care Financing.
Title
Establishing a community health center transformation fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-05 | House | Accompanied by S755 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S755 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1276
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S777 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S777 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1276.pdf |