MA H1276 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4767
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to transfers of military-grade controlled property to state law enforcement agencies. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to military grade controlled property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4767 |
2017-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H1720 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1690 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1720 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1114 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1102 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2018
H1690 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H4265 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2018
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1276 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1276.pdf |