MA H1274 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the definition of low and moderate income housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of low and moderate income housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02JointHearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H256 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1782 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2800 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H3350 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3440 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2427 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H642 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2833 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2312 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback