MA H1267 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing access to health care services for all residents through a single payer Medicare for all health care financing system. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing Medicare for all in Massachusetts

Sponsors

Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Steven Owens [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Orlando Ramos [D]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Rep. Carol Doherty [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]Rep. Kip Diggs [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14JointHearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S766 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1195 (Similar To) 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1224 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback