MA H1263 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S825
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to intercollegiate athletic compensation and rights. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to college athlete compensation
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Christopher Worrell [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Francisco Paulino [D] |
Rep. Orlando Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-06 | House | Accompanied by S825 and H1267 |
2023-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1263 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1263.pdf |