MA H1259 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4713
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require higher educational institutions to provide certain information to students applying for or changing their major field of study. Higher Education.
Title
Promoting educational awareness and opportunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4713 |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H538 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4399
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4356 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4399 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4713 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4356 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4399 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4713 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1259 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1259.pdf |