MA H1254 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the modification the number of days for the imposition of late fees for unpaid rent. Housing.
Title
Relative to the modification of late fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5089 |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1357 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1347 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1688 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1463 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1316 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3768 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1347 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1688 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H1463 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1316 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3768 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1254.pdf |