MA H1241 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4767
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to publishing uniform use of deadly force guidelines. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to uniform use of deadly force guidelines
Sponsors
Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Byron Rushing [D] |
Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4767 |
2017-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2315 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1210 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied S1257
H769 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1249 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
S1027 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1285 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1284 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1210 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied S1257
H769 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1249 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
S1027 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1285 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1284 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1241 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1241.pdf |