MA H1240 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S782
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid coverage for doula services. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to Medicaid coverage for doula services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Accompanied S782 |
2023-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S782 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1240 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1240.pdf |