MA H1234 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4634

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing for an individual Medicare marketplace option. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an individual Medicare marketplace option

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4634
2023-06-05JointHearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S1772 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S372 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H1239 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H2563 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback