MA H1230 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4533
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require ambulatory surgicenters and clinical laboratories to serve MassHealth enrollees. Health Care Financing.
Title
Requiring ambulatory surgicenters and clinical laboratories to serve MassHealth enrollees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4533 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4533 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1230 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12216&generalCourtId=1 |