MA H123 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clarifying the continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and sales persons. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Clarifying the continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and sales persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-08-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-08-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-08-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H123 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9799&generalCourtId=1 |