MA H1221 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4625

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting the use of all latex gloves and products by persons who handle food. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of all latex gloves and products by persons who handle food

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4625
2017-08-24JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback