MA H1218 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to group health insurance for dependent children of deceased members or subscribers. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to group health insurance for dependent children of deceased members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4486 |
2012-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-07-25 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4486 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1218 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12830&generalCourtId=1 |