MA H1213 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to direct the Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority to establish a college savings program for each eligible child born and issued a birth certificate in the Commonwealth. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a child savings program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseHouse concurred
2020-11-19SenateAmendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence
2020-11-19SenateReporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-18HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S1684 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3618 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2611 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback