MA H121 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to preventing funds deposited in children’s savings accounts from counting against cash assistance benefits. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Preventing funds deposited in children’s savings accounts from counting against cash assistance benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H121 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H121.pdf |