MA H1199 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to Medicare savings programs eligibility. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding Medicare savings programs eligibility

Sponsors

Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Sen. James Welch [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H615 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in 428

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback