MA H1180 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the the maximum amount of deductibles and copayments for covered services for active and retired employees, their dependents and the survivors of deceased public employees. Health Care Financing.
Title
Limiting out of pocket expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2253 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2258 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2342 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2409 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
H2253 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2258 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2342 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2409 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1180 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1180.pdf |