MA H1168 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act establishing a special commission to make an investigation and study of the feasibility of a pilot program for accreditation of alcohol-and drug-free housing By Mr. Walsh of Boston, a petition of Martin J. Walsh, John Hart, Jr. and Sean Garballey establishing a special commission (including members of the General Court) to make an investigation and study of the feasibility of a pilot program for accreditation of alcohol-and drug-free housing. Housing.
Title
Establishing a special commission to make an investigation and study of the feasibility of a pilot program for accreditation of alcohol-and drug-free housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1168 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1168.pdf |