MA H115 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appropriate and safe placement for certain children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Regarding the appropriate and safe placement for certain children
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H115 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H115.pdf |