MA H1146 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to public housing innovation program. Housing.
Title
Relative to public housing innovation program
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Martha Walz [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4211 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 18, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, May 28, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4211 (Replaced by) 2014-07-14 - New draft substituted, see H4306
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1146 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1146.pdf |