MA H1145 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of certain hotels and motels in connection with the Emergency Housing Assistance Program. Housing.
Title
Relative to prohibiting the use of hotels and motels in connection with the emergency housing assistance program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4209 |
2015-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4209 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1774 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1874 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3115 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2194 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3116 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1774 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1874 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3115 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2194 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3116 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1145.pdf |