MA H1144 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1167

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-10)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to safe patient handling in certain health facilities. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to safe patient handling in certain health facilities

Sponsors

Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Robert Koczera [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. James Dwyer [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. James Miceli [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Sheila Harrington [R]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]
Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. David Nangle [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-05-23HouseAccompanied by S1167
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-14HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H110 (Similar To) 2017-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S498 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1064 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1167 (Replaces) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback