MA H1144 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate vendors providing emergency housing assistance. Housing.
Title
Relative to reforming the emergency housing assistance program
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4209 |
2015-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4209 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1774 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1874 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3115 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2194 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3116 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1774 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1874 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3115 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2194 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3116 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1144 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1144.pdf |