MA H1139 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the conservation restrictions and agricultural preservation statutes. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Amending the conservation restrictions and agricultural preservation statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3943 |
2011-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3943 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1139 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10365&generalCourtId=1 |