MA H1104 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to generic medications. Financial Services.
Title
To ensure access to generic medication
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] |
Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1906 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3933
H915 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S640 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H1226 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
H3933 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H915 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S640 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H1226 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
H3933 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1104.pdf |