MA H1099 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a transportation network driver bill of rights. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing a transportation network driver bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-31 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/06/2023 from 10:30 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 10:30 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1157 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2211 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H1916 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2108 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
S627 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2211 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H1916 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2108 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
S627 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1099 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1099.pdf |