MA H1098 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to colon cancer under the age of 50 years of age, prevalence, screening and insurance coverage and care. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to colon cancer under the age of 50 years of age, prevalence, screening and insurance coverage and care in the Commonwealth aka Martha's Bill

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26JointHearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H4145 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback