MA H1095 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4590

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the zoning law to promote smart growth multifamily housing production. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to smart growth multifamily housing production

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4590
2017-04-24JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S83 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2237 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3845
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
S2130 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2131 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4075 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4290
H4590 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4981 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback