MA H1092 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a special commission to study condominium law By Mr. Beaton of Shrewsbury, a petition of Matthew A. Beaton for an investigation by a special commission of the condominium laws. Housing.
Title
Relative to a special commission to study condominium law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2014-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2013 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1092 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1092.pdf |