MA H1091 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing certain health insurance coverage. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for certain health insurance coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-26SenateSenate concurred
2022-03-31HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-03-29HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2021-11-29JointHearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1137 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback