MA H1091 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4208

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include mobile homes in the definition of affordable housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the definition of affordable housing to include manufactured homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4208
2016-01-26JointHearing scheduled for 02/02/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H4208 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4327 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H4035 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2016
H4646 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback